SJ Computers, LLC v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: SJ Computers, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv02482
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Wiegert, Joel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Wiegert, Joel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wiegert, Joel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Wiegert, Joel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Wiegert, Joel)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/27/2021.(TJS)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Wiegert, Joel)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Wiegert, Joel)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Jointly Signed by SJ Computers, LLC. (Wiegert, Joel)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Syed S. Ahmad for SJ Computers, LLC; granting #7 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Latosha M. Ellis for SJ Computers, LLC. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/22/2021. (NAH)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Latosha M. Ellis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9146840 filed by SJ Computers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Oeltjenbruns, Kelly)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Syed S. Ahmad. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9146783 filed by SJ Computers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Oeltjenbruns, Kelly)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Syed S. Ahmad, Latosha M. Ellis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (lmb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-2482 (PJS/DFJ). (lmb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff SJ Computers, LLC. (Oeltjenbruns, Kelly)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9139316) filed by SJ Computers, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-1 (Part 1 of 2, Pages 1-50), #3 Exhibit(s) 1-2 (Part 2 of 2, Pages 50-100), #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4, #7 Exhibit(s) 5, #8 Exhibit(s) 6, #9 Exhibit(s) 7, #10 Exhibit(s) 8, #11 Exhibit(s) 9, #12 Exhibit(s) 10, #13 Exhibit(s) 11, #14 Exhibit(s) 12, #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oeltjenbruns, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SJ Computers, LLC v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ Computers, LLC
Represented By: Kelly R. Oeltjenbruns
Represented By: Latosha M. Ellis
Represented By: Syed S. Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Joel T Wiegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?