NewRez LLC v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and New Penn Financial, LLC
Defendant: Mark R. Brown, Therese M. Brown, Central Bank and United States of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv02610
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Porter, Melissa)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER in Response to #4 Request. United States of America answer due 1/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/17/2021. (TJB)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #4 Request (Repp, Liles)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Request. (Repp, Liles)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by United States of America. (Repp, Liles)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-2610 (ECT/DTS). (MKB)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County State Court - Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-CV-21-13515 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit 1- State Court Summons, #2 Summons and Complaint Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Service Exhibit 3 - State Affidavit of Service, #4 Cover Letter Exhibit 4 - State Service Letter, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Repp, Liles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NewRez LLC v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Gary Joseph Evers
Represented By: David R Mortensen
Represented By: Melissa Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Penn Financial, LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Evers
Represented By: David R Mortensen
Represented By: Melissa Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therese M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?