Gauthier v. Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Jason Gauthier
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 0:2021cv02672
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #16 . Mail not re-sent no forwarding address known as to James Gauthier. (KDS)
January 28, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent no forwarding address known as to James Gauthier. (KNK) Document QC'd by ACH on 2/8/2022 (ACH).
January 26, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jason Gauthier. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/26/2022. (ALM)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Bureau of Prisons re #14 Declaration, #13 Response to Habeas Petition (Rau, Kristen)
January 25, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Kara Anderl re #13 Response to Habeas Petition by Federal Bureau of Prisons . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rau, Kristen)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Rau, Kristen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kara Anderl re #10 Response, by Federal Bureau of Prisons . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rau, Kristen)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Bureau of Prisons re #10 Response (Rau, Kristen)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #9 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REQUESTED REFILING. Anderl Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (CLK).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER in Response to #6 Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/14/2022. (ALM)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Bureau of Prisons re #7 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 Request (Rau, Kristen)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Request. (Rau, Kristen)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITION by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Rau, Kristen)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/16/2021. (ALM)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00159. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty per 3rd/4th Prisoner List.
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jason Gauthier: This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. The Clerk's office is directed to send the entire file to the District of Minnesota and retain a copy of the file for this district's records. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/14/2021 (case electronically transferred to District of Minnesota) (copy w/NEF mailed to Pet). (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 12/15/2021.]
December 14, 2021 FEE Receipt: $5.00, receipt number IAN110030705 for filing fee by Jason Gauthier (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 12/15/2021.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jason Gauthier. Dismissal Deadline 3/28/2022. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 12/15/2021.]
December 13, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 12/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier v. Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?