Rice v. Pasansen et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Rice
Defendant: Barb Pasansen, Shelly Schraut and Lynn Sadler
Case Number: 0:2021cv02686
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION REQUEST for Court Appointed Counsel filed by Daniel Joseph Rice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Daniel Joseph Rice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/7/2002. (TJB)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/7/2022. (NEM)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Daniel Joseph Rice. (NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 2/4/22. (kt)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Daniel Joseph Rice. (NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 2/4/22. (kt)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Barb Pasansen, Lynn Sadler, Shelly Schraut filed by Daniel Joseph Rice. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 2/4/22. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Pasansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barb Pasansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Schraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?