Smith v. Starr et al
Plaintiff: Fellicia Smith
Defendant: Starr, Hiller, Wilson, Nelson and Federal Correctional Institution
Case Number: 0:2021cv02703
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 35 Reply to Response to Motion re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fellicia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
February 11, 2022 Filing 34 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Appeal Packet, #2 Civil Notice - appeal)(KNK) Modified text on 2/11/2022 (KNK).
February 11, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #34 Judgment was entered in error and Closed flag removed. (KNK)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting #18 Report and Recommendation: denying without prejudice #16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Fellicia Smith. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/10/2022. (SMD)
February 3, 2022 Filing 32 (Text-Only) NO OBJECTIONS TO #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson.(Voss, Ana)
February 3, 2022 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson re #27 Declaration, #30 Declaration, #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #29 Declaration, #28 Declaration, (Voss, Ana)
February 3, 2022 Filing 30 DECLARATION of JACQUELINE WILSON re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) WILSON A, #2 Exhibit(s) WILSON B, #3 Exhibit(s) WILSON C, #4 Exhibit(s) WILSON D)(Voss, Ana)
February 3, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of JEREMIAH LEE re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) LEE A, #2 Exhibit(s) LEE B, #3 Exhibit(s) LEE C, #4 Exhibit(s) LEE D)(Voss, Ana)
February 3, 2022 Filing 28 DECLARATION of CRAIG DOLSBERRY re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) DOLSBERRY A, #2 Exhibit(s) DOLSBERRY B, #3 Exhibit(s) DOLSBERRY C, #4 Exhibit(s) DOLSBERRY D)(Voss, Ana)
February 3, 2022 Filing 27 DECLARATION of SHANNON BOLDT re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) BOLDT A, #2 Exhibit(s) BOLDT B, #3 Exhibit(s) BOLDT C, #4 Exhibit(s) BOLDT D)(Voss, Ana)
February 3, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Voss, Ana)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #24 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/2/2022. (LNP)
February 1, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to AMENDMENT OF ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT re #1 Complaint, filed by Fellicia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER in Response to #20 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/27/2022.(LNP)
January 26, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson re #21 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #20 Request (Voss, Ana)
January 26, 2022 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Request. (Voss, Ana)
January 26, 2022 Filing 20 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson. (Voss, Ana) Modified text on 1/27/2022 (kt).
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000177 in the amount of $37.54 issued to Fellicia Smith. (NAH)
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fellicia Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/21/2022.(LNP)
January 18, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Fellicia Smith in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fellicia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Placeholder for Objections Acocmpanying Exhibit L)(kt)EXHIBIT L FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/18/2022. (kt) Document QC'd on 1/31/2022 (JME).
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fellicia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 1/31/2022 (JME).
January 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Voss, Ana)
January 13, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Fellicia Smith. Federal Correctional Institution served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Hiller served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Nelson served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Starr served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Wilson served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (CLK)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: Smith's initial partial filing fee in this case, under the formula provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), will be 20 percent of the average deposits amount, or $37.54. That amount ($37.54) must be paid by Smith within 21 days of the date of this order, failing which it will be recommended that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/4/2022.(LNP)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per #8 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (kt)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson. (kt)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Fellicia Smith re #8 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Fellicia Smith. (KNK)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/21/2021. (LNP)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Fellicia Smith. (JGK) Modified text on 1/27/2022 (kt).
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint, filed by Fellicia Smith.(JGK)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Fellicia Smith re #1 Complaint, by Fellicia Smith. (JGK)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Fellicia Smith re #1 Complaint, by Fellicia Smith. (JGK)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Fellicia Smith. (JGK)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Correctional Institution, Hiller, Nelson, Starr, Wilson filed by Fellicia Smith. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F, #2 Envelope) (JGK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 2/4/22. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Starr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fellicia Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiller
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Correctional Institution
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?