Helget v. Fitbit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gerald E. Helget
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021mc00010
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE that the case has been transferred/extracted to the District of Massachusetts. (MKB)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #1 Petition that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, and the Clerk of Court is directed to effectthe transfer. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/5/2021. (MKB) Modified text on 3/8/2021 (MKB).
March 4, 2021 Filing 24 Declaration of Michelle Moran in Support of #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Gerald E. Helget. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Stull, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Gerald E. Helget. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance)(Stull, Melissa)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Okano for Fitbit, Inc.; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Yar Chaikovsky for Fitbit, Inc.; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chad J. Peterman for Fitbit, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/3/2021. (NAH)
March 1, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Chad Peterman in Opposition to #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K)(Laud, Sanjiv)
March 1, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Laud, Sanjiv)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chad Peterman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8555079 filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Laud, Sanjiv)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yar Chaikovsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8555069 filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Laud, Sanjiv)
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Okano. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8554722 filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Laud, Sanjiv)
March 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Fitbit, Inc.. (Vitt, J)
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Fitbit, Inc.. (Laud, Sanjiv)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ruben Rodrigues for Gerald E. Helget; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michelle A Moran for Gerald E. Helget. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/24/2021. (NAH)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEFING ORDER re Plaintiff Gerald E. Helget's Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts. See order for dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/22/2021. (ALM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald E. Helget re #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Stull, Melissa)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Date and time to be determined. (Stull, Melissa) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (MMP).
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald E. Helget re #4 Meet and Confer Statement, #7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle A. Moran. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8517682, #3 Declaration in Support, #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ruben J. Rodrigues. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8517673, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605), #5 Proposed Order to Judge, (Stull, Melissa)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (Miscellaneous) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-mc-10 (WMW/HB). (MKB)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle A. Moran. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8517682 filed by Gerald E. Helget. (Stull, Melissa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ruben J. Rodrigues. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8517673 filed by Gerald E. Helget. (Stull, Melissa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Gerald E. Helget.(Stull, Melissa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1 Initiating Petition/Motion (Miscellaneous Case) filed by Gerald E. Helget.(Stull, Melissa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of Melissa R. Stull in Support of #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Gerald E. Helget. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stull, Melissa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605) filed by Gerald E. Helget. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance)(Stull, Melissa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena or in the Alternative Transfer the Motion to Quash Subpoena to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts (filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMNDC-8517605). (Stull, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helget v. Fitbit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald E. Helget
Represented By: Melissa R Stull
Represented By: Ruben Rodrigues
Represented By: Michelle A Moran
Represented By: George W Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By: Chad J. Peterman
Represented By: J Thomas Vitt
Represented By: Yar Chaikovsky
Represented By: David Okano
Represented By: Sanjiv Prakash Laud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?