Weisen v. Southpond III LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Defendant: Southpond III LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv00064
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Southpond III LLC. (Barth, Schaan)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Southpond III LLC response due 3/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/9/2022.(TMA)
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Barth, Schaan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #4 Stipulation Second - For Extension of Time by Southpond III LLC. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey Weisen. (Barth, Schaan)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Southpond III LLC response due 2/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/13/2022.(TMA) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (TMA).
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Barth, Schaan)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION by Southpond III LLC. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey Weisen and Southpond III LLC. (Barth, Schaan)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-64 (WMW/ECW). (KNK)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Southpond III LLC. (Barth, Schaan)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9260626) filed by Southpond III LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barth, Schaan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisen v. Southpond III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southpond III LLC
Represented By: Schaan Barth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?