Smartmatic USA Corp. et al v. Lindell et al
Plaintiff: Smartmatic USA Corp., Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and SGO Corporation Limited
Defendant: Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv00098
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Michael J. Lindell (Mohrman, William)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/3/2022.(MME)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER on #67 Stipulation. Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/3/2022.(MME)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #67 Stipulation. (Bloom, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION for ESI Protocol by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. Jointly Signed by Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc.. (Bloom, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #65 Stipulation. (Bloom, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION for Protective Order by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. Jointly Signed by Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc.. (Bloom, Michael)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Motions (non-disp) due by 6/30/2023. Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2023. Ready for trial due by 4/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/12/2022.(MTB)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/12/2022. (MTB)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. Jointly Signed by Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc..(Bloom, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew J Langley for SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and Smartmatic USA Corp.; granting #60 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Julie Loftus for SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and Smartmatic USA Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/5/2022. (KMO)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie M. Loftus. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9803628 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Langley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9803603 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for My Pillow, Inc.. (Eslick, Matthew)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint filed by My Pillow, Inc.. (Eslick, Matthew)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Eslick, Matthew)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Eslick on behalf of My Pillow, Inc.. (Eslick, Matthew)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Eslick on behalf of Michael J. Lindell. (Eslick, Matthew)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 10/5/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom audio (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(MTB)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Dismiss/General; denying #23 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/19/2022. (DAC)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2022 re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by My Pillow, Inc., #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. to Notify Court of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coomer v. Trump MTD Order, #2 Exhibit B - Dominion v. Byrne MTD Order)(Bloom, Michael)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Elliot Bloom for SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and Smartmatic USA Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/11/2022. (KMO)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Bloom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9503508 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell, My Pillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Parker, Andrew)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (MKB).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendants Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc.'s #42 letter requesting an extension of the word count for their consolidated reply to #41 Plaintiffs' response in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendants' reply brief must be limited to 5,734 or fewer words. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/19/2022. (RJE)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Parker, Andrew)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Plaintiffs' Omnibus Brief in Opposition to Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Joel)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiffs Smartmatic USA Corp., Smartmatic International Holding B.V., and SGO Corporation Limited's #39 letter requesting an extension of the word count for Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition to #18 Defendant Michael J. Lindell's and #23 Defendant My Pillow, Inc.'s motions to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss must be limited to 20,000 or fewer words. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/6/2022. (MKO)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Manske, William)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Parker on behalf of Michael J. Lindell. (Parker, Andrew)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel pursuant to LR 83.7(b) (Daniels, Douglas)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nathan Lewin for My Pillow, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/24/2022. (ABR)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan Lewin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9403543 filed by My Pillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heath Novosad for Michael J. Lindell. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/23/2022. (ABR)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heath A Novosad. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9402171 filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Mohrman, William)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Douglas A. Daniels for Michael J. Lindell. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/22/2022. (ABR)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. #18 , #23 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/22/2022.(TJS)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas A. Daniels. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9400444 filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Mohrman, William)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Nathan Lewin, Alan Dershowitz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant My Pillow, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #23 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Parker, Andrew)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #23 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by My Pillow, Inc..(Pull, Joseph)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by My Pillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Parker, Andrew)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell.(Mohrman, William)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by My Pillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell.(Mohrman, William)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 EXHIBIT Index of Exhibits re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D)(Mohrman, William)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mohrman, William)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Mohrman, William)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Mohrman, William)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Smartmatic USA Corp., SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V.. My Pillow, Inc. waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Connolly, Joel)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Smartmatic USA Corp., SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V.. Michael J. Lindell waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Connolly, Joel)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Maura Levine-Patton for SGO Corporation Limited, for Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and for Smartmatic USA Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/20/2022. (ABR)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joel Erik Connolly for SGO Corporation Limited, for Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and for Smartmatic USA Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/20/2022. (ABR)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicole Wrigley for SGO Corporation Limited, for Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and for Smartmatic USA Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/20/2022. (ABR)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maura T. Levine-Patton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9273750 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Erik Connolly. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9273734 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole E. Wrigley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9273721 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Smartmatic International Holding B.V.. (Manske, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff SGO Corporation Limited. (Manske, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing J. Erik Connolly, Nicole E. Wrigley, Maura T. Levine-Patton as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael J. Lindell, My Pillow, Inc. (MMP)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-98 (WMW/JFD). (MMP)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael J. Lindell, My Pillow, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9270476) filed by Smartmatic USA Corp., SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15, #17 Exhibit(s) 16, #18 Exhibit(s) 17, #19 Exhibit(s) 18, #20 Exhibit(s) 19, #21 Exhibit(s) 20, #22 Exhibit(s) 21, #23 Exhibit(s) 22, #24 Exhibit(s) 23, #25 Exhibit(s) 24, #26 Exhibit(s) 25, #27 Exhibit(s) 26, #28 Exhibit(s) 27, #29 Exhibit(s) 28, #30 Exhibit(s) 29, #31 Exhibit(s) 30, #32 Exhibit(s) 31, #33 Exhibit(s) 32, #34 Exhibit(s) 33, #35 Exhibit(s) 34, #36 Exhibit(s) 35, #37 Exhibit(s) 36, #38 Exhibit(s) 37, #39 Exhibit(s) 38, #40 Exhibit(s) 39, #41 Exhibit(s) 40, #42 Exhibit(s) 41, #43 Exhibit(s) 42, #44 Exhibit(s) 43, #45 Exhibit(s) 44, #46 Exhibit(s) 45, #47 Exhibit(s) 46, #48 Exhibit(s) 47, #49 Exhibit(s) 48, #50 Exhibit(s) 49, #51 Exhibit(s) 50, #52 Exhibit(s) 51, #53 Exhibit(s) 52, #54 Exhibit(s) 53, #55 Exhibit(s) 54, #56 Exhibit(s) 55, #57 Exhibit(s) 56, #58 Exhibit(s) 57, #59 Exhibit(s) 58, #60 Exhibit(s) 59, #61 Exhibit(s) 60, #62 Exhibit(s) 61, #63 Exhibit(s) 62, #64 Exhibit(s) 63, #65 Exhibit(s) 64, #66 Exhibit(s) 65, #67 Exhibit(s) 66, #68 Exhibit(s) 67, #69 Exhibit(s) 68, #70 Exhibit(s) 69, #71 Exhibit(s) 70, #72 Exhibit(s) 71, #73 Exhibit(s) 72, #74 Exhibit(s) 73, #75 Exhibit(s) 74, #76 Exhibit(s) 75, #77 Exhibit(s) 76, #78 Exhibit(s) 77, #79 Exhibit(s) 78, #80 Exhibit(s) 79, #81 Exhibit(s) 80, #82 Exhibit(s) 81, #83 Exhibit(s) 82, #84 Exhibit(s) 83, #85 Exhibit(s) 84, #86 Exhibit(s) 85, #87 Exhibit(s) 86, #88 Exhibit(s) 87, #89 Exhibit(s) 88, #90 Exhibit(s) 89, #91 Exhibit(s) 90, #92 Exhibit(s) 91, #93 Exhibit(s) 92, #94 Exhibit(s) 93, #95 Exhibit(s) 94, #96 Exhibit(s) 95, #97 Exhibit(s) 96, #98 Exhibit(s) 97, #99 Exhibit(s) 98, #100 Exhibit(s) 99, #101 Exhibit(s) 100, #102 Exhibit(s) 101, #103 Exhibit(s) 102, #104 Exhibit(s) 103, #105 Exhibit(s) 104, #106 Exhibit(s) 105, #107 Exhibit(s) 106, #108 Exhibit(s) 107, #109 Exhibit(s) 108, #110 Exhibit(s) 109, #111 Exhibit(s) 110, #112 Exhibit(s) 111, #113 Exhibit(s) 112, #114 Exhibit(s) 113, #115 Exhibit(s) 114, #116 Exhibit(s) 115, #117 Exhibit(s) 116, #118 Exhibit(s) 117, #119 Exhibit(s) 118, #120 Exhibit(s) 119, #121 Exhibit(s) 120, #122 Exhibit(s) 121, #123 Exhibit(s) 122, #124 Exhibit(s) 123, #125 Exhibit(s) 124, #126 Exhibit(s) 125, #127 Exhibit(s) 126, #128 Exhibit(s) 127, #129 Exhibit(s) 128, #130 Exhibit(s) 129, #131 Exhibit(s) 130, #132 Exhibit(s) 131, #133 Exhibit(s) 132, #134 Exhibit(s) 133, #135 Exhibit(s) 134, #136 Exhibit(s) 135, #137 Exhibit(s) 136, #138 Exhibit(s) 137, #139 Exhibit(s) 138, #140 Exhibit(s) 139, #141 Exhibit(s) 140, #142 Exhibit(s) 141, #143 Exhibit(s) 142, #144 Civil Cover Sheet) (Manske, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smartmatic USA Corp. et al v. Lindell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smartmatic USA Corp.
Represented By: Christopher K Larus
Represented By: Emily Jean Tremblay
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Maura Levine-Patton
Represented By: Nicole Wrigley
Represented By: Michael Elliot Bloom
Represented By: Matthew J Langley
Represented By: Julie Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smartmatic International Holding B.V.
Represented By: Christopher K Larus
Represented By: Emily Jean Tremblay
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Maura Levine-Patton
Represented By: Nicole Wrigley
Represented By: Michael Elliot Bloom
Represented By: Julie Loftus
Represented By: Matthew J Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGO Corporation Limited
Represented By: Christopher K Larus
Represented By: Emily Jean Tremblay
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Maura Levine-Patton
Represented By: Nicole Wrigley
Represented By: Michael Elliot Bloom
Represented By: Julie Loftus
Represented By: Matthew J Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Lindell
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Douglas A. Daniels
Represented By: Heath Novosad
Represented By: Matthew R. Eslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Pillow, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Nathan Lewin
Represented By: Ryan Malone
Represented By: Matthew R. Eslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?