United States of America v. 15418 Hampshire Lane, Savage, Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 15418 Hampshire Lane, Savage, Minnesota, 5594 Candy Cove Trail SE, Prior Lake, Minnesota, 5604 Candy Cove Trail SE, Prior Lake, Minnesota, 3847 Cane Run Road, Louisville, Kentucky, 6200 South 3rd Street, Louisville. Kentucky, 2722 Park Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 2742 Park Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 5150 Alvarado Lane in Plymouth, Minnesota, 2529 12th Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 301-309 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 311-319 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 3018 3rd Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 8432 Noble Ave N., Brooklyn Park, Minnesota and 13825 Edgewood Avenue South, Savage, Minnesota
Claimant: Abdiaziz Farah, Salim Said, Abdi Nur Salah, Ahmed Sharif Omar-Hashim, Empire Enterprises, LLC and Abdiwahab Mohamud
Case Number: 0:2022cv00154
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File an Answer by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Abdiwahab Mohamud. (Baune, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to to File an Answer by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Abdi Nur Salah. (Baune, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File an Answer by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Salim A. Said. (Baune, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 13 CLAIM Verified Claim filed by 13825 Edgewood Avenue South, Savage, Minnesota. (Cotter, Patrick)
March 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L Cotter on behalf of 13825 Edgewood Avenue South, Savage, Minnesota. (Cotter, Patrick)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 CLAIM Owner filed by 301-309 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 3018 3rd Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 311-319 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. (Steck, Jason)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Steck on behalf of 301-309 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 3018 3rd Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 311-319 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. (Steck, Jason)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 CLAIM contests the forfeiture filed by 5594 Candy Cove Trail SE, Prior Lake, Minnesota. (Schupp, Timothy)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 CLAIM contests the forfeiture filed by 15418 Hampshire Lane, Savage, Minnesota. (Schupp, Timothy)
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 CLAIM Verified Claim filed by 2722 Park Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 8432 Noble Ave N., Brooklyn Park, Minnesota. (Hendrick, Kristin)
March 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin C. Hendrick on behalf of 2722 Park Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 8432 Noble Ave N., Brooklyn Park, Minnesota. (Hendrick, Kristin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified filed by 2529 12th Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 8432 Noble Ave N., Brooklyn Park, Minnesota. (Toder, Brian)
March 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian N Toder on behalf of 2529 12th Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 8432 Noble Ave N., Brooklyn Park, Minnesota. (Toder, Brian)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 CLAIM for Possession filed by 5150 Alvarado Lane in Plymouth, Minnesota. (Colich, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 22-cv-154 SRN/DTS. (kt)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 15418 Hampshire Lane, Savage, Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15418 Hampshire Lane, Savage, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5594 Candy Cove Trail SE, Prior Lake, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5604 Candy Cove Trail SE, Prior Lake, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3847 Cane Run Road, Louisville, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6200 South 3rd Street, Louisville. Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2722 Park Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota
Represented By: Kristin C. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2742 Park Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5150 Alvarado Lane in Plymouth, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2529 12th Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota
Represented By: Brian N Toder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 301-309 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota
Represented By: Jason Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 311-319 (odd addresses) East Lake Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota
Represented By: Jason Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3018 3rd Avenue South, Minneapolis, Minnesota
Represented By: Jason Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8432 Noble Ave N., Brooklyn Park, Minnesota
Represented By: Brian N Toder
Represented By: Kristin C. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13825 Edgewood Avenue South, Savage, Minnesota
Represented By: Patrick L Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Abdiaziz Farah
Represented By: Timothy R Schupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Salim Said
Represented By: Michael J Colich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Abdi Nur Salah
Represented By: Brian N Toder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ahmed Sharif Omar-Hashim
Represented By: Kristin C. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Empire Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Timothy R Schupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Abdiwahab Mohamud
Represented By: Jason Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?