Wolf v. Fikes et al
Petitioner: Russell Eugene Wolf
Respondent: J. Fikes and BOP
Case Number: 0:2022cv00194
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BOP, J. Fikes re #6 Response, #7 Declaration (Rau, Kristen)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Derrick Lee-Lo re #6 Response by BOP, J. Fikes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rau, Kristen)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by BOP, J. Fikes.(Rau, Kristen)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/10/2022. (JRS)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000210 in the amount of $5 issued to Russell Eugene Wolf. (NAH)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of BOP, J. Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Russell Eugene Wolf (JGK)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Russell Eugene Wolf. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Fikes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Eugene Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BOP
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?