Juarez v. Bosh
Plaintiff: Inmate Jose Santoya Juarez
Defendant: Warden Guy Bosh
Petitioner: Jose Santoya Juarez
Case Number: 0:2022cv00204
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #10 Judgment by Jose Santoya Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Dahl, Richard)
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MKB)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Report and Recommendation #6 is ACCEPTED. Petitioner Jose Santoya Juarez's Objections to the Report and Recommendation #7 are OVERRULED. The Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 is DENIED. The Application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED as frivolous. No certificate of appealability shall issue. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/1/2022.(RMM)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation filed by Guy Bosh. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Passe, Julianna)
February 21, 2022 Filing 7 OBJECTION TO #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate filed by Jose Santoya Juarez. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Dahl, Richard)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Santoya Juarez, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jose Santoya Juarez Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/7/2022.(TMA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Guy Bosh. (Passe, Julianna)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Guy Bosh Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-204 (ECT/ECW). (KNK)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Jose Santoya Juarez. (Dahl, Richard) Modified text on 1/27/2022 (kt).
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jose Santoya Juarez. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Exhibits, #2 Appendix of Related Cases, #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #4 Certificate of Service, (#5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, to be filed separately - In Forma Pauperis Petition), #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dahl, Richard) Modified text on 1/26/2022 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez v. Bosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inmate Jose Santoya Juarez
Represented By: Richard Arthur Dahl, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Guy Bosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Santoya Juarez
Represented By: Richard Arthur Dahl, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?