Johnson v. State of Minnesota
Petitioner: Michael Alfred Johnson
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2022cv00294
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Alfred Johnson Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/23/2022.(TMA)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 EXHIBITS filed by Michael Alfred Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 RECEIPT number 34641016418 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Michael Johnson. (KNK)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 CONCLUSION OF LAW filed by Michael Alfred Johnson.(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/24/2022 (JME).
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 (Second) Letter to the U.S. District Court from Michael Johnson filed by Michael Alfred Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/24/2022 (JME).
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER to U.S. District Court from Michael Johnson filed by Michael Alfred Johnson.(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/24/2022 (JME).
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 CONCLUSION of this Matter filed by Michael Alfred Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 3/16/2022 (CLK).
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Michael Johnson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Michael Alfred Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 3/14/2022 (CLK).
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Schmidt on behalf of State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State of Minnesota Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Michael Alfred Johnson (JGK)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Alfred Johnson.(JGK)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Alfred Johnson. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Alfred Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Jean E Burdorf
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?