Hollie v. Essentia Health Moose Lake Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Hollie
Defendant: Essentia Health Moose Lake Clinic, Benjamin Marsh and Jane/John Does
Case Number: 0:2022cv00314
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Gross on behalf of Benjamin Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Charles)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A Schramm on behalf of Benjamin Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schramm, Tracy)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER from Clerk's Office. (ACH)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Shannon Hollie. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 3/25/22 by MMP. Modified text on 3/25/2022 (MMP).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Shannon Hollie. (ACH) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (ACH).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for Letter to Clerk's Office. The documents were not attached to this entry so it was marked as filed in error and redocketed. (ACH)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shannon Hollie re #12 MOTION FOR RULE 60 RELIEF AND RECONSIDERATION AND NOTICE, #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion (ACH) document QC'd on 3/14/2022 (MKB).
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION FOR RULE 60 RELIEF AND RECONSIDERATION AND NOTICE filed by Shannon Hollie.(ACH) document QC'd on 3/14/2022 (MKB).
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION FOR RULE 60 RELIEF AND RECONSIDERATION AND NOTICE filed by Shannon Hollie. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 3/14/2022 (MKB).
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants Essentia Health Moose Lake Clinic and Benjamin Marsh. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 4/11/2022. (MKB)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Shannon Hollie. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) document QC'd on 3/14/2022 (MKB).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Hollie. (MKB)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/1/2022. (JLB)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Shannon Hollie re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Proposed Order to Judge (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shannon Hollie.(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shannon Hollie.(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Notice filed by Shannon Hollie. (KNK) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Shannon Hollie. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Essentia Health Moose Lake Clinic, Jane/John Does, Benjamin Marsh filed by Shannon Hollie. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollie v. Essentia Health Moose Lake Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Hollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Health Moose Lake Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Marsh
Represented By: Charles Gross
Represented By: Tracy A Schramm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?