Arafat v. Fikes
Petitioner: Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat
Respondent: Jeffrey Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00370
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #16 , #17 , #15 . Mail sent to Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat at 2825 East Lake Street, Minneapolis, MN 55406 returned as undeliverable. Re-mailed to updated address on docket sheet. (MKB)
March 31, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY re #15 Response filed by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) cc: Arafat. Modified text on 4/1/2022 (CLK).
March 28, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #19 and #20 . Mail sent to Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat at 2825 East Lake Street, Minneapolis, MN 55406 returned as undeliverable. No forwarding address available mail not resent. (MKB) Modified text on 3/29/2022 (MKB).
March 22, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Fikes re #18 Certificate of Service, #16 Declaration, #17 Declaration, #15 Response (Blumenfield, Chad)
March 21, 2022 Filing 20 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE ENTRY. NOTICE of Change of Address by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (MKB) Modified text on 3/22/2022 (MKB).
March 21, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Fikes re #16 Declaration, #17 Declaration, #15 Response (Blumenfield, Chad)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Mark DeLoia re #15 Response by Jeffrey Fikes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Blumenfield, Chad)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #15 Response by Jeffrey Fikes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfield, Chad)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeffrey Fikes.(Blumenfield, Chad)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 3/30/2022 (MTB).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. This matter is before the court on Petitioner's recently filed Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF No. #11 ] and Letter to Magistrate Judge [ECF No. #12 ]. Petitioner's most recent filing, although not identical to his original petition [ECF No. #1 ], does not vary in substance from the original petition. Further, in his letter, Petitioner disclaims any intent to amend his original petition and confirms that he continues to challenge the revocation of his good-time credit as described in his original petition. Accordingly, the Court will treat the original Petition filed at ECF No. #1 as the operative petition, and Respondent must answer that document as previously ordered. [See ECF No. #10 .] Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/23/2022.(MJA)
February 22, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 3/3/2022 (MTB).
February 22, 2022 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jeffrey Fikes. filed by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MKB) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (LNP). Qc'd on 3/11/2022 (KNK).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Respondent to file answer within 30 days of this Order. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/17/2022. (LNP)
February 17, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #3 EMERGENCY MOTION REQUESTING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF UNDER 2241. The NEF was regenerated as exhibits were missing. The exhibits were rescanned and attached. (JME)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 Withdrawal of #3 Emergency Motion Requesting Habeas Corpus Relief Under 2241 by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Modified text on 2/17/2022 (kt). Document QC'd on 2/28/2022 (MTB).
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Jeffrey Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/10/2022.(LNP) cc: Arafat with new 2241 petition and order. Modified text on 2/10/2022 (MMP).
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE Susan Richard Nelson by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 2/17/2022 (JME).
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION REQUESTING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF UNDER 2241 filed by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (JGK) Document QC'd on 2/14/2022 (ACH). (Missing exhibits scanned and added on 2/17/2022: #1 Exhibit(s)) (JME). Modified text on 2/17/2022 (JME).
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. (JGK) Document QC'd on 2/14/2022 (ACH).
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 2/14/2022 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arafat v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheikh Bilaal Muhammad Arafat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?