Foos v. Eischen
Petitioner: Michael Justin Foos
Respondent: B. Eischen
Case Number: 0:2022cv00398
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER in Response to #8 Request. B. Eischen response to Petition due 4/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/31/2022. (TJB)
March 30, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. Eischen re #8 Request, #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Rau, Kristen)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request to Extend Time to Respond to Petition #8 Request. (Rau, Kristen)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST to Extend Time to Respond to Petition by B. Eischen. (Rau, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Directing Clerk to terminate the following motion(s): #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/22/2022. (TJB)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 OBJECTION/LETTER TO #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Michael Justin Foos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 RECEIPT number 44641113278 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Christopher Grupe. (MMP)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VACATED PER ORDER #7 //REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Justin Foos. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/14/2022. (TJB) Modified text on 3/23/2022 (ACH).
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of B. Eischen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Michael Justin Foos (JGK)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Justin Foos. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D, #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foos v. Eischen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Justin Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Eischen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?