Kuklenski v. Medtronic USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jan Kuklenski
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv00438
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mrkonich, Marko)
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jan Kuklenski. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Halunen, Clayton)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 5), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/10/2022.(TJS)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Mrkonich, Marko)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Medtronic USA, Inc..(Mrkonich, Marko)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mrkonich, Marko)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Mrkonich, Marko)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Mrkonich, Marko)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jan Kuklenski re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued as to Medtronic USA, Inc. (Halunen, Clayton)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Medtronic USA, Inc. (MMP)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-438 (ECT/JFD). (MMP)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medtronic USA, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9333958) filed by Jan Kuklenski. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Halunen, Clayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuklenski v. Medtronic USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Kuklenski
Represented By: Pamela M Spera
Represented By: Clayton D Halunen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Claire B. Deason
Represented By: Daniel Bihrle
Represented By: Marko J Mrkonich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?