Garcia v. Eischen
Petitioner: Sergio Ernesto Garcia
Respondent: B. Eischen
Case Number: 0:2022cv00444
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. Eischen re #7 Declaration, #6 Response to Habeas Petition (Hoskins, Adam)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Kyja Winger re #6 Response to Habeas Petition by B. Eischen . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hoskins, Adam)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by B. Eischen. (Hoskins, Adam)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of B. Eischen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hoskins, Adam)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/7/2022. (JRS)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 RECEIPT number 44641113371 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Sergio Ernesto Garcia. (KNK) Document QC'd on 3/3/2022 (ABR).
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Sergio Ernesto Garcia re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Garcia (NAH)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sergio Ernesto Garcia. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th/Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/28/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Eischen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Ernesto Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Eischen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?