Aery v. Bethel et al
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Defendant: Port Bethel, Sue Girot and Employees
Case Number: 0:2022cv00456
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 OBJECTION TO #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by James Paul Aery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB) Document QC'd on 3/31/2022 (MTB).
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James Paul Aery filed by James Paul Aery, #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by James Paul Aery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/22/2022. (TJB)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James Paul Aery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAH) Document QC'd on 2/24/2022 (JME).
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Port Bethel, Employees, Sue Girot filed by James Paul Aery. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 6th/Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/24/2022 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aery v. Bethel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Bethel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Girot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?