Cox v. Harpsted et al
Plaintiff: Samuel I. Cox
Defendant: Jodi Harpsted, Members Unknown, Ann Zimmerman, Phil Olson, Tammy, Unit 1C Staff, Rachael, Allison Collins, Paul Mayfield, Jessica Davison, Cindy and Mike
Case Number: 0:2022cv00478
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, and Ann Zimmerman answers due 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 4/21/2022. (TJS)
April 20, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman. (McGregor, Sparrowleaf)
April 20, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman re #24 Declaration in Support, #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #25 Meet and Confer Statement, #26 Proposed Order to Judge, #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (McGregor, Sparrowleaf)
April 20, 2022 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman.(McGregor, Sparrowleaf) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (kt).
April 20, 2022 Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman.(McGregor, Sparrowleaf) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (kt).
April 20, 2022 Filing 24 Declaration of Leaf McGregor in Support of #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Leaf McGregor)(McGregor, Sparrowleaf) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (kt).
April 20, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(McGregor, Sparrowleaf) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (kt).
April 20, 2022 Filing 22 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED AT #28 . MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman. (McGregor, Sparrowleaf) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (kt).
April 18, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Allison Collins, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Phil Olson, Ann Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGregor, Sparrowleaf)
April 14, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel I. Cox. Cindy served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Allison Collins served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Jessica Davison served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Jodi Harpsted served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Paul Mayfield served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Members Unknown(Client Placement Committee, John Doe/Jane Doe) served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Members Unknown(MSOP Administrations, Jane Doe/John Doe) served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Mike served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Phil Olson served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Rachael served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Tammy served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Unit 1C Staff served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Ann Zimmerman served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. (MMP)
April 14, 2022 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Ann Zimmerman filed by Samuel I. Cox. (MMP)
April 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants Jodi Harpsted, Phil Olson, Tammy, Rachael, Cindy, Mike, Paul Mayfield, Jessica Davison, Ann Zimmerman, and Allison Collins. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 5/5/2022. (MMG)
April 1, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER enclosing USM forms filed by Samuel Cox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
March 31, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Tammy, Unit 1C Staff, Ann Zimmerman. (ACH)
March 31, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Cindy, Allison Collins, Jessica Davison, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Members Unknown(Client Placement Committee, John Doe/Jane Doe), Members Unknown(MSOP Administrations, Jane Doe/John Doe), Mike, Phil Olson, Rachael. (ACH)
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Samuel I. Cox re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Samuel I. Cox. (ACH)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending denial of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, filed by Samuel I. Cox. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/24/2022. (ALM)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying #8 Motion to Compel; denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/24/2022. (ALM)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel I. Cox.(MMP) Document QC'd on 3/21/2022 (KDS).
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION/DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Samuel I. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter/Response to Letter, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 3/21/2022 (KDS).
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS 1983 COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint, filed by Samuel I. Cox.(ACH) Document QC'd on 4/6/2022 (JME).
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 37(a)(2), FED.R.CIV.P., FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY filed by Samuel I. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 4/6/2022 (JME).
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Samuel I. Cox. (ACH)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Samuel Cox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 4/5/2022 (JME).
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel I. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 4/6/2022 (JME).
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Samuel Cox (cc: Cox w/ Motion Forms). (NAH)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction & Restraining Order. (NAH)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Samuel I. Cox. (NAH)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cindy, Allison Collins, Jessica Davison, Jodi Harpsted, Paul Mayfield, Members Unknown(Client Placement Committee, John Doe/Jane Doe), Members Unknown(MSOP Administrations, Jane Doe/John Doe), Mike, Phil Olson, Rachael, Tammy, Unit 1C Staff, Ann Zimmerman filed by Samuel I. Cox. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Harpsted et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel I. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Harpsted
Represented By: Sparrowleaf Dilts McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Zimmerman
Represented By: Sparrowleaf Dilts McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Olson
Represented By: Sparrowleaf Dilts McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit 1C Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Collins
Represented By: Sparrowleaf Dilts McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mayfield
Represented By: Sparrowleaf Dilts McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?