Li-Bachar v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Yumei Li-Bachar
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. and Ethicon, LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv00485
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yumei Li-Bachar. Ethicon, Inc. waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Williams, Amanda)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J Van Steenburgh on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandie L Morgenroth on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yumei Li-Bachar (Williams, Amanda)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alyson L Oliver for Yumei Li-Bachar. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/3/2022. (JGK)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alyson Oliver. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9358558 filed by Yumei Li-Bachar. (Williams, Amanda)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Alyson Oliver as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (kt)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-485 WMW/JFD. (kt)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9349106) filed by Yumei Li-Bachar. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li-Bachar v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yumei Li-Bachar
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Alyson L Oliver
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Brandie L Morgenroth
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Brandie L Morgenroth
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?