Fiorito v. Fikes
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00486
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER: Petitioner Michael Fiorito requests a thirty-day extension to file objections to the Report and Recommendation. ECF No. 5. As cause for an extension, Fiorito describes limitations on his ability to conduct legal research and communicate with the court while confined in FCI Sandstone's "Special Housing Unit." See id. This is a sufficient factual basis for such an extension. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT Fiorito's Motion for Extension of Time [ECF No. 5] is GRANTED. Fiorito shall file objections to the Report and Recommendation on or before May 12, 2022. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 4/12/2022. (RMM)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Fiorito (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) cc: Michael Fiorito (MTB)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Fiorito. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/16/2022.(JLB)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michael Fiorito re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Fiorito (NAH)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Fiorito. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th/Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorito v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?