Walton v. Fikes
Petitioner: James Walton and James Earl Walton
Respondent: Jeffrey Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00506
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in EASTERN DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA as case 5:22-hc-02071, filed 04/13/2022.(kt)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Eastern District of North Carolina. (CLK)
April 11, 2022 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: #4 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations was not intended to be filed in this case. Please see #5 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations instead. (CLK)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Granting #2 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by James Earl Walton. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/8/2022. (SMD)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN WRONG CASE - DOCUMENT RESTRICTED. ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Granting #2 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by James Earl Walton. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/8/2022.(SMD) Modified text on 4/8/2022 (JME). Modified text on 4/11/2022 (CLK).
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by James Earl Walton Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/23/2022.(TMA)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue to the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by James Earl Walton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB) Document QC'd on 4/5/2022 (MTB).
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-1113365) filed by James Earl Walton. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Modified text on 3/9/2022 (MTB). Document QC'd on 3/30/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Earl Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?