Well v. State of Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well
Defendant: State of Minnesota, Fifth Judicial District, Christopher Rowney, Jennifer Clements, Breck Rolfsrud, Jill Baker, Elizabeth Levine and Christopher Rovney
Case Number: 0:2022cv00507
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well filed by Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well, #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/8/2022.(LNP)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well. (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/30/2022 (MTB).
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Jill Baker, Jennifer Clements, Fifth Judicial District, Elizabeth Levine, Breck Rolfsrud, Christopher Rovney, State of Minnesota filed by Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Modified text on 3/1/2022 (MTB). Document QC'd on 3/30/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Well v. State of Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buomkuoth Gatluak Puot Well
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Judicial District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breck Rolfsrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rovney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?