Franklin v. Fikes
Petitioner: Warren Franklin
Respondent: Warden J. Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00646
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/19/2022. (EB)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER to the Court re: #4 Receipt as to Warren Franklin (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 44641113640 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Warren Franklin. (MTB) Document QC'd on 3/31/2022 (ABR).
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of J. Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Warren Franklin (JGK)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Warren Franklin. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/31/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden J. Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?