Dalton v. Karvonen & Son, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julie Dalton
Defendant: Karvonen & Son, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv00649
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12188 Americans with Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/27/2022.(RMM)
June 24, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Colella, Nicholas)
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Julie Dalton. Jointly Signed by Karvonen & Sons, Inc.. (Colella, Nicholas)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2022. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2002. Motions (non-disp) due 1/31/2023. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2023. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/7/2022.(JLB)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED SEE #13 ** PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2022. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2002. Motions (non-disp) due 1/31/2023. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2023. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/7/2022.(JLB) Modified text on 6/8/2022 (JLB).
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Karvonen & Son, Inc.. (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Julie Dalton. Jointly Signed by Karvonen & Son, Inc..(Colella, Nicholas)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Julie Dalton. (Colella, Nicholas)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Karvonen & Son, Inc.. (Fullerton, Ryan)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Colella for Julie Dalton. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/25/2022. (ABR)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas A. Colella. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9403223 filed by Julie Dalton. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 6th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Judge David S. Doty and Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-649 ECT/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing R. Bruce Carlson, Ian M. Brown, Nicholas A. Colella as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-649 DSD/JFD. (MMG)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9382534) filed by Karvonen & Son, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fullerton, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Karvonen & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Dalton
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Represented By: Nicholas Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karvonen & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?