Nelson v. Minneapolis Public Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Warren F. Nelson
Defendant: Minneapolis Public Housing Authority
Case Number: 0:2022cv00697
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE by Warren F. Nelson Notice to Defendants to Preserve Evidence (Nelson, Warren)
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #14 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #13 Proposed Order to Judge filed by Warren F. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Email to Counsel for Defendant)(Nelson, Warren)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Minneapolis Public Housing Authority response due 5/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/3/2022. (TMA)
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 EXHIBIT Exhibit 67 re #12 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #1 Complaint, filed by Warren F. Nelson. (Nelson, Warren)
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Minneapolis Public Housing Authority.(Thompson, Jeremy)
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 EXHIBIT 1,3-8,18,25,29,45,49,55,61-62,65-67 Exhibits referenced in Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Warren F. Nelson. (Nelson, Warren)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. (Thompson, Jeremy)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Thompson on behalf of Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. (Thompson, Jeremy)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne L Jones on behalf of Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. (Jones, Suzanne)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warren F. Nelson. Minneapolis Public Housing Authority served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (ACH)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per #4 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (kt)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. (kt)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete. (MTB)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/21/2022. (TMA)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Warren F. Nelson is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Warren F. Nelson has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Warren F. Nelson. (JGK) Document QCd on 3/30/2022 (MMG).
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Minneapolis Public Housing Authority filed by Warren F. Nelson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Rights Housing list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QCd on 3/30/2022 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Minneapolis Public Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren F. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Public Housing Authority
Represented By: Jeremy Thompson
Represented By: Suzanne L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?