Thomas v. Ramsey County Sheriffs et al
Plaintiff: Antwan Darc-el Thomas
Defendant: Ramsey Co. ADC, Ramsey County Sheriffs, St. Paul Police Officers, Great Britain and Sgt. Brent Wittner
Case Number: 0:2022cv00698
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail sent to Antwan Darc-el Thomas at St. Peter Regional Treatment Center was returned undelivered, marked unable to forward. Re-mailed #9 Order to most recent address listed on docket. (CLK)
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 EXHIBITS 23 and 24 filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (kt) Document QC'd on 5/13/2022 (JME).
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 SEALED LETTER to District Judge by Antwan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)EXHIBIT FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 5/9/22. (kt) Document QC'd on 5/13/2022 (JME).
May 6, 2022 Filing 14 EXHIBIT 20 filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 15 and 19, #2 Envelope)(MMG)
May 6, 2022 Filing 13 EXHIBIT 16 filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG)
May 6, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER to the Court filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 22 and 21, #2 Envelope)(MMG)
May 3, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail sent to Antwan Thomas at Ramsey County ADC address was returned to sender not at this address. Re-mailed #9 Order to St. Peter Regional Treatment Center as listed on return envelope. (MMP)
April 22, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #7 Amended Complaint: rescanned page 5. (MTB)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff must sign his amended complaint, [Docket No. #7 ], within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/15/2022.(JLB) cc: Thomas. (kt)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 EXHIBIT 3 re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 4, #2 Exhibit(s) 5, #3 Exhibit(s) 6, #4 Exhibit(s) 7, #5 Exhibit(s) 8, #6 Exhibit(s) 9, #7 Exhibit(s) 10, #8 Exhibit(s) 11, #9 Envelope)(MMP) Document QCd on 4/21/2022 (MMG).
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Britain, Ramsey County Sheriffs, St. Paul Police Officers. filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (MKB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #5 Rescanned page 5 of Amended Complaint) (MTB). Document QC'd on 4/22/2022 (MTB).
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (MMP) Document QC'd on 4/22/2022 (MTB).
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (MKB) Document QC'd on 4/22/2022 (MTB).
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT #7 . AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ramsey Co. ADC. filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (MKB) Modified text on 3/29/2022 (MKB).
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Antwan Thomas (JGK)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Antwan Darc-el Thomas. (JGK) Document QCd on 3/30/2022 (MMG).
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Ramsey Co. ADC filed by Antwan Darc-el Thomas. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QCd on 3/30/2022 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ramsey County Sheriffs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Darc-el Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey Co. ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Britain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Brent Wittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?