Braun v. State of Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Defendant: State of Minnesota, MNDOC, Commissioner of Corrections, Chairs and Ranking Minority Members of the House of Representatives and Senate Committees, Minnesota Correctional Facility and Step-Down Management Program, The
Case Number: 0:2022cv00710
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 EXHIBITS 1-3 re #10 MOTION to Proceed without Paying any of the Partial Filing Fee due to Adverse Party Failure to Comply with Orders from the Court filed by Nathan Christopher Braun.(MMP)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed without Paying any of the Partial Filing Fee due to Adverse Party Failure to Comply with Orders from the Court filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nathan Christopher Braun filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MKB)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MKB)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has been advised that prison authorities at MCF-Stillwater, where Plaintiff is currently incarcerated, need additional time to prepare an accurate prison trust account statement responsive to this Court's orders in Case Nos. 22-cv-710 (ECF No. #5 ) and 22-cv-528 (ECF No. #4 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the required documentation shall be mailed to the Court no later than April 22, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/13/2022.(LNP) cc: Prison Financial Authorities at Stillwater. Modified text on 4/13/2022 (MMP).
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to Nathan Christopher Braun enclosing re #5 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court cc: Prison Authorities, MCF-Stillwater (MMP)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/30/2022.(LNP)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Nathan Christopher Braun (JGK)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Chairs and Ranking Minority Members of the House of Representatives and Senate Committees, Commissioner of Corrections, MNDOC, Minnesota Correctional Facility, State of Minnesota, Step-Down Management Program, The filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. State of Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairs and Ranking Minority Members of the House of Representatives and Senate Committees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Step-Down Management Program, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?