Fiorito v. June et al
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Respondent: Lele June and Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00759
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: John F Docherty
2 Judge: Tony N Leung
3 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Michael Fiorito need not respond to the April 11, 2022 order to show cause in Case No. 22-CV-0797 [ECF No. 4]. 2. The remainder of plaintiff's motions filed on May 20, 2022 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/23/2022.(CLG)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION Seeking Clarification and Possibly Leave of the Court filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying #13 Motion to Supplement. SEE ORDER FOR DATES AND DETAILS. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/9/2022. (CLG)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Petitioners MOTION to Supplement filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QCd on 4/28/2022 (MMG).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michael Fiorito. cc:Michael Fiorito with copy of #1 Complaint. (MMG)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER to Clerk's Office from Michael Fiorito filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 5/26/2022 (MTB).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PETITIONERS OBJECTION TO HAVING TO RAISE AN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT re #3 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 5/26/2022 (MTB).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-759 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/18/2022. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/19/2022.(MMG)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Fikes, Lele June Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2022 (MTB).
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of Fikes, Lele June. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/31/2022. (JLD)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael Fiorito. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Fiorito. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorito v. June et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lele June
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?