Fiorito v. Mr. Drummy et al
Plaintiff: Michael Fiorito
Defendant: Mr. Drummy, Ms. Oetterer, Ms. Southwick, Kara Anderal, Ms. Harris and Andrew M. Luger
Case Number: 0:2022cv00923
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
2 Judge: Tony N Leung
3 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Michael Fiorito need not respond to the April 11, 2022 order to show cause in Case No. 22-CV-0797 [ECF No. 4]. 2. The remainder of plaintiff's motions filed on May 20, 2022 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/23/2022. (CLG)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION Seeking Clarification and Possibly Leave of the Court filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/11/2022.(CLG)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; #11 Motion to Enforce Default; #12 Motion to Remand to State Court; #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. SEE ORDER FOR DATES AND DETAILS. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/9/2022. (CLG)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michael Fiorito regarding #15 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. (CLK)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(CLK)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QCd on 6/7/2022 (MMG).
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QCd on 6/7/2022 (MMG).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO ENFORCE DEFAULT, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 5/26/2022 (MTB).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-923 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/18/2022. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/19/2022.(MMG)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER: On April 15, 2022, the Defendants filed a Motion to Extend Time and for Miscellaneous Relief [Docket No. #4 ], requesting an extension of time to respond, that the Plaintiff pay the filing fee within ninety (90) days, and that no party to this suit may file any document in this matter, with the exception of Plaintiff Fiorito's IFP application, without prior leave of Court, before the filing of the response to the Complaint on or before July 19, 2022. Based upon review of the files and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants are granted an extension until July 19, 2022, to answer of otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/18/2022.(JLB)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kara Anderal, Andrew M. Luger, Mr. Drummy, Ms. Harris, Ms. Oetterer, Ms. Southwick re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Proposed Order to Judge, #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief (Rau, Kristen)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kara Anderal, Andrew M. Luger, Mr. Drummy, Ms. Harris, Ms. Oetterer, Ms. Southwick.(Rau, Kristen)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief : Date and time to be determined. (Rau, Kristen)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kara Anderal, Andrew M. Luger, Mr. Drummy, Ms. Harris, Ms. Oetterer, Ms. Southwick. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rau, Kristen)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kara Anderal, Andrew M. Luger, Mr. Drummy, Ms. Harris, Ms. Oetterer, Ms. Southwick. (Rau, Kristen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Kara Anderal, Andrew M. Luger, Mr. Drummy, Ms. Harris, Ms. Oetterer, Ms. Southwick Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-923 NEB/LIB. (CLK)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County - Fourth Judicial District filed by Ms. Harris, Ms. Southwick, Ms. Oetterer, Andrew M. Luger, Mr. Drummy, Kara Anderl. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rau, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorito v. Mr. Drummy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Drummy
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Oetterer
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Southwick
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Anderal
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Harris
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?