Taco John's International, Inc. et al v. Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC et al
Plaintiff: Taco John's International, Inc. and Spicy Seasonings, LLC
Defendant: Juan Ramos, Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC, Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC, Juan Ramos Gutierez and Juan Jose Ramos-Gutierez
Counter Defendant: Taco John's International, Inc
Case Number: 0:2022cv01050
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Protective Order and Order by Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC, Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC, and Juan Ramos a/k/a Juan Ramos Gutierez a/k/a Jose Ramos-Gutierez. (Young, Christopher)
June 9, 2022 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc, Taco John's International, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC, Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC, and Juan Ramos a/k/a Juan Ramos Gutierez a/k/a Jose Ramos-Gutierez.(Young, Christopher)
June 8, 2022 Filing 21 First STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Defendants. (Hutton, Lee)
June 8, 2022 Filing 20 First STATEMENT OF CASE as to Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc.. (Young, Christopher)
May 25, 2022 Filing 19 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc.. (Bruno, Harold)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC, Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC. (Hahn, Kyle)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Patrick Hahn on behalf of All Defendants. (Hahn, Kyle)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Patrick Hahn on behalf of All Defendants. (Hahn, Kyle)
May 16, 2022 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiffs. filed by Juan Ramos. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hahn, Kyle) Modified text on 5/17/2022 (MMP).
May 6, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc.. (Young, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taco John's International, Inc., Spicy Seasonings, LLC. Juan Ramos served on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (Young, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taco John's International, Inc., Spicy Seasonings, LLC. Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC served on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (Young, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taco John's International, Inc., Spicy Seasonings, LLC. Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC served on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (Young, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (AO 120), #5 Summons Issued (Young, Christopher)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Labor for Spicy Seasonings, LLC and for Taco John's International, Inc..; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney, Harold R. Bruno, III for Spicy Seasonings, LLC and for Taco John's International, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/28/2022. (KMO)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Young. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9473650 filed by Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc.. (Young, Christopher)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Young. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9473525 filed by Spicy Seasonings, LLC, Taco John's International, Inc.. (Young, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Juan Ramos, Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC, Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC. (MKB)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (6th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-1050 (JRT/LIB). (MKB)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Young, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Juan Ramos, Juan Ramos Gutierez, Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC, Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC filed by Taco John's International, Inc., Spicy Seasonings, LLC.. (Young, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9470343) filed by Taco John's International, Inc., Spicy Seasonings, LLC.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-3) (Young, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taco John's International, Inc. et al v. Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Ramos
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Hahn
Represented By: Lee A Hutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Chon Mexican Grill LLC
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Hahn
Represented By: Lee A Hutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Chon Mexican Grill II LLC
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Hahn
Represented By: Lee A Hutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Ramos Gutierez
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Hahn
Represented By: Lee A Hutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Jose Ramos-Gutierez
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Hahn
Represented By: Lee A Hutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taco John's International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A Young
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Represented By: Nicholas Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spicy Seasonings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Young
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Represented By: Nicholas Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Taco John's International, Inc
Represented By: Christopher A Young
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Represented By: Nicholas Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?