Yang v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lee Yang
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2022cv01264
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2022 at 11:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR - DISCLOSURES by Lee Yang.(Cody, David) Modified text on 6/9/2022 (MSK).
May 13, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 22-cv-1264 (WMW/BRT).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (KNK)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wood, Brian)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9499812) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Yang
Represented By: David K Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?