LaRose v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Dale LaRose and Arthur David LaRose
Defendant: Deb Haaland, Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, US Department of Interior, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, United States Department of the Interior and Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The
Case Number: 0:2022cv01603
Filed: June 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 25 U.S.C. ยง 1302 Indian Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 43 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JME)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [27, 32] are GRANTED and the Complaint #3 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to the tribal defendants and WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION as to the federal defendants. 2. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/2/2023. (CLG)
November 21, 2022 Filing 41 REQUEST for a MP3 COPY of a Digital Audio Recording for #40 Motion Hearing,,, before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz held on 11-9-2022 at 10:02 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS). Payment made in the amount of $32, receipt number AMNDC-9903485. (Bibeau, Frank)
November 9, 2022 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2022 re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The, Catherine Chavers, #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose, #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior. Motions taken under advisement, written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Paula Richter) (CLG)
November 2, 2022 Filing 39 Reply to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brodeen, Philip)
November 2, 2022 Filing 38 Reply to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hair, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General by Federal and Tribal Defendants filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate word count certificate)(Bibeau, Frank)
September 28, 2022 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior.(Hair, Christopher)
September 28, 2022 Filing 35 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #32 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior.(Hair, Christopher)
September 28, 2022 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hair, Christopher)
September 28, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested, #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Hair, Christopher)
September 28, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior. (Hair, Christopher)
September 28, 2022 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The.(Brodeen, Philip)
September 28, 2022 Filing 30 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The.(Brodeen, Philip)
September 28, 2022 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brodeen, Philip)
September 28, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested, #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Brodeen, Philip)
September 28, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The. (Brodeen, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 26 Reply to Response to Motion re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Plaintiff's REPLY Brief)(Bibeau, Frank)
July 18, 2022 Filing 25 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (CLG)
July 15, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Declaration of James C. Redman, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4, #7 Exhibit(s) 5, #8 Exhibit(s) 6, #9 Exhibit(s) 7, #10 Exhibit(s) 8, #11 Exhibit(s) 9, #12 Exhibit(s) 10, #13 Exhibit(s) 11, #14 Exhibit(s) 12, #15 Exhibit(s) 13, #16 Exhibit(s) 14)(Hair, Christopher)
July 15, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brodeen, Philip)
July 13, 2022 Filing 22 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The hearing on the defendants' motions to dismiss scheduled for 11/9/2022 will begin at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS). (CLG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/13/2022.(CLG)
July 13, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Michael Brodeen on behalf of Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The. (Brodeen, Philip)
July 13, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Hair on behalf of Deb Haaland, United States Department of the Interior. (Hair, Christopher)
June 28, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur David LaRose re #14 Briefing Order Service of motion, memorandum, proposed order and order on defendants (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Bibeau, Frank)
June 28, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose.(Bibeau, Frank)
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Bibeau, Frank)
June 28, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bibeau, Frank)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEFING ORDER. See order for dates and details. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 6/28/2022.(CLG)
June 27, 2022 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED. Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Proposed Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/28/2022 (KNK).
June 27, 2022 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED. Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/28/2022 (KNK).
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED. >Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Injunction, Habeas and Declaratory Relief >Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/28/2022 (KNK). Modified text on 6/28/2022 (KNK).
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Bibeau, Frank)
June 27, 2022 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REFILED, SEE Doc. no. #10 . Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Habeas and Declaratory Relief - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Arthur David LaRose. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR. ALL TO BE REFILED//(Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Motion, #2 Exhibit(s) Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Injunction and other relief, #3 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/27/2022 (ACH). Modified text on 6/28/2022 (KNK).
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur David LaRose re #3 Complaint,,, for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Bibeau, Frank)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Deb Haaland, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The, United States Department of the Interior. (CLK)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-1603 PJS/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #3 Complaint, filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Deb Haaland, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The, United States Department of the Interior filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/22/2022 (KNK).
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. CIVIL COVER SHEET re #3 Complaint,,, filed by Catherine Chavers, Gary Frazer, Deb Haaland, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The, United States Department of the Interior filed by Arthur David LaRose. (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/22/2022 (CLK).
June 21, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9585874) filed by Arthur Dale LaRose. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Leech Lake Tribal Court Affidavit with exhibits CV-22-58, #2 Exhibit(s) IBIA Wadena challenge to 2005 Sec Election, #3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Leech Lake Tribal Court Complaint and Exhibits, #4 Exhibit(s) Leech Lake Tribal Court Case CV-22-58 briefs exhibits and orders, #5 Exhibit(s) Leech Lake Tribal Court of Appeals Case No. AP-22-01, #6 Exhibit(s) MCT - Leech Lake Reservation Election Results 2022, 2018 and 2014, #7DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Civil Cover Sheet) (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (CLK).
June 21, 2022 Filing 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants. filed by Arthur Dale LaRose. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Leech Lake Tribal Court Affidavit with exhibits CV-22-58, #2 Exhibit(s) IBIA Wadena challenge to 2005 Sec Election, #3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Leech Lake Tribal Court Complaint and Exhibits, #4 Exhibit(s) Leech Lake Tribal Court Case CV-22-58 briefs exhibits and orders, #5 Exhibit(s) Leech Lake Tribal Court of Appeals Case No. AP-22-01, #6 Exhibit(s) MCT - Leech Lake Reservation Election Results 2022, 2018 and 2014, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (ACH).
June 19, 2022 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9583456) filed by Arthur Dale LaRose. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Leech Lake Tribal Court Affidavit with exhibits CV-22-58, #2 Exhibit(s) IBIA Wadena challenge to 2005 Sec Election, #3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Leech Lake Tribal Court Complaint and Exhibits, #4 Exhibit(s) Leech Lake Tribal Court Case CV-22-58 briefs exhibits and orders, #5 Exhibit(s) Leech Lake Tribal Court of Appeals Case No. AP-22-01, #6 Exhibit(s) MCT - Leech Lake Reservation Election Results 2022, 2018 and 2014, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bibeau, Frank) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRose v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Dale LaRose
Represented By: Frank W Bibeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur David LaRose
Represented By: Frank W Bibeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Christopher Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Chavers
Represented By: Greg S Paulson
Represented By: Philip Michael Brodeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Frazer
Represented By: Philip Michael Brodeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Chippewa Tribe
Represented By: Greg S Paulson
Represented By: Philip Michael Brodeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Christopher Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Chippewa Tribe Tribal Election Court of Appeals, The
Represented By: Greg S Paulson
Represented By: Philip Michael Brodeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?