Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. v. Allen Interchange LLC et al
Plaintiff: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Allen Interchange LLC, Applegate Supply, Patriot Parts of Texas, Bluestone Auto Products, OEM Surplus, Autoworks Distributing and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 0:2022cv01681
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Sear, John)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL BE REFILED. REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Sear, John) Modified text on 8/1/2022 (MMG).
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. No summons requested. (Sear, John)
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois are no longer assigned to this case.NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-1681 (KMM/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMP)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th Division Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-1681 (JRT/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Sear, John)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9604209) filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sear, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. v. Allen Interchange LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: John D Sear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Interchange LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applegate Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Parts of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestone Auto Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OEM Surplus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoworks Distributing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?