Craft v. Eischen
Petitioner: Charles Craft
Respondent: Warden Eischen
Case Number: 0:2022cv02032
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Eischen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 400000289 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Charles Craft. (MMP) Qc'd(KNK).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to VACATE the Report and Recommendation of September 13, 2022 #3 . Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by no later than October 11, 2022, why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/21/2022. (ALM)
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charles Craft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(ACH)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED PER #5 ORDER FILED ON 9/21/22 - REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Craft. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/13/2022. (ALM) Modified text on 9/22/2022 (MMP).
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Charles Craft (JGK)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Craft. Case assigned to Judge Kate M. Menendez per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft v. Eischen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Eischen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?