Zebro v. AmTrust North America
Plaintiff: Michael Zebro
Defendant: AmTrust North America
Case Number: 0:2022cv02129
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2023. Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2023. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 8/15/2023. Motions (disp) due by 9/15/2023. Ready for trial due by 1/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/21/2022.(JLB)
October 11, 2022 Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Zebro.(Kemp, Michael) Modified text on 10/12/2022 (ACH).
October 11, 2022 Filing 14 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//STIPULATION by Michael Zebro. Jointly signed by AmTrust North America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Amended Summons and Complaint)(Kemp, Michael) Modified text on 10/12/2022 (CLK). Modified text on 10/12/2022 (ACH).
October 11, 2022 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Zebro. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kemp, Michael) Modified text on 10/12/2022 (ACH).
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Zebro. (Kemp, Michael) Modified text on 10/12/2022 (ACH).
October 7, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Michael Zebro. (Kemp, Michael)
October 7, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CASE as to AmTrust North America. (Fleming, Kimberly)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED ON CM/ECF IN ERROR - WILL NOT BE REFILED. PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re PT Scheduling Order. (Fleming, Kimberly) Modified text on 10/11/2022 (JLB).
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT Rule 26(f) by AmTrust North America. (Fleming, Kimberly)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron William Ferguson on behalf of Michael Zebro. (Ferguson, Aaron)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 EXHIBIT/Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AmTrust North America. (Fleming, Kimberly) Modified text on 8/30/2022 (MKB).
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2129 (NEB/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.. (Fleming, Kimberly)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex A) (Fleming, Kimberly)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Aitkin County District Court, case number 01-CV-22-694 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9731245) filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fleming, Kimberly) Modified text on 8/30/2022 (ABR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zebro v. AmTrust North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zebro
Represented By: Charles Jeremy Lagasse
Represented By: Aaron William Ferguson
Represented By: Michael Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust North America
Represented By: Kimberly Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?