Jensen-Athey v. U.S. Postal Service
Plaintiff: Schyler Toby Jensen-Athey
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Case Number: 0:2022cv02232
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas B. Draisey on behalf of U.S. Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Draisey, Lucas)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #3 Request. U.S. Postal Service answer due 11/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/27/2022.(JLB)
September 27, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Postal Service re #3 Request, #4 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Voss, Ana)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond #3 Request. (Voss, Ana)
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. Postal Service. (Voss, Ana)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2232 PJS/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Stearns Seventh Judicial District, case number 73-CO-22-642 filed by U.S. Postal Service. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Voss, Ana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen-Athey v. U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schyler Toby Jensen-Athey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Lucas B. Draisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?