Huntington National Bank v. Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank
Defendant: Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc. and Douglas Davis
Case Number: 0:2022cv02271
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/24/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc.. (Thompson, Mark)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark K Thompson on behalf of All Defendants. (Thompson, Mark)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint filed by Douglas Davis, Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc.. (Thompson, Mark)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Schroeder, Mark)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Douglas Davis served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Schroeder, Mark)
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Douglas Davis, Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc. (MMP)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master List, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 22-cv-2271 (NEB/DTS).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Huntington National Bank. (Schroeder, Mark)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas Davis, Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9767981) filed by Huntington National Bank. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schroeder, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntington National Bank v. Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Daniel N Moak
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician's Auditing and Billing Services Inc.
Represented By: Mark K Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Davis
Represented By: Mark K Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?