Lindell et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Michael J Lindell, My Pillow, Inc., Michael J. Lindell and MyPillow, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, Honorable Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, Christopher Wray, Merrick Garland and United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the
Case Number: 0:2022cv02290
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/17/2022. (SK)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #71 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray.(Jacobson, Jonathan)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #58 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (Parker, Andrew)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials #36 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for Return of Property #9 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/3/2022. (RMM)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #58 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (MKB) Document QC'd on 10/28/2022 (ABR).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc. . (Parker, Andrew)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a supplemental letter to the Court #59 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/24/2022. (RMM)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 EXHIBIT Exhibit A re #59 MOTION Leave to file Supplemental Letter to the Court filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc..(Parker, Andrew)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #59 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc..(Parker, Andrew)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Letter #59 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Parker, Andrew)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #59 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc..(Parker, Andrew)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION Leave to file Supplemental Letter to the Court filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc. ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 10/21/2022 (MMP).
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric C. Tostrud: Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2022 re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Return of Property filed by MyPillow, Inc., Michael J. Lindell, #36 MOTION Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials filed by MyPillow, Inc., Michael J. Lindell. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (RMM)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Teitelbaum on behalf of All Defendants. (Teitelbaum, Aaron)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials filed by Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Jonathan)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Aaron Teitelbaum for Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, United States of America and Christopher Wray. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/14/2022. (KMO)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Parker, Andrew)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Aaron Teitelbaum filed by United States of America. (Baune, Craig)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Lin on behalf of All Defendants. (Lin, Frank)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Frank Lin for Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, United States of America and Christopher Wray Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/7/2022. (KMO)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Jonathan E. Jacobson in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property filed by Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Jacobson, Jonathan) CD RECEIVED IN CLERK's OFFICE ON 10/7/22. (kt)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property filed by Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray.(Jacobson, Jonathan)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #42 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/6/2022. (SK)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Frank Lin filed by United States of America. (Baune, Craig)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration of Andrew D. Parker in Support of #42 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Access to Warrant Materials filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Parker, Andrew)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY re #42 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Access to Warrant Materials filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Parker, Andrew)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Access to Warrant Materials filed by Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray.(Jacobson, Jonathan)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to the Motion for Expedited Handling of Motion to Obtain Warrant Application Materials (Dkt. 42) by 9:00 am on Thursday, October 6, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/5/2022.(TMA)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Access to Warrant Materials filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Access to Warrant Materials #36 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Parker, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #36 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc..(Parker, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Declaration of Andrew D. Parker in Support of #36 MOTION Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 and 2)(Parker, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Parker, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #36 MOTION Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials : Date and time to be determined. (Parker, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION Obtain Access to Warrant Application Materials filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 EXHIBIT List re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property , #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Parker, Andrew)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick M. McSweeney for Michael J. Lindell. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/30/2022. (KMO)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric C. Tostrud: Status Conference held on 9/30/2022. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (RMM)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick M. McSweeney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9792820 filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Parker, Andrew)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. Instructions for joining the call have been sent to counsel.(RMM)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of All Defendants. (Voss, Ana)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Baune on behalf of All Defendants. (Baune, Craig)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Jacobson on behalf of All Defendants. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Jonathan Edward Jacobson for United States of America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/23/2022. (JGK)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Jonathan E. Jacobson filed by United States of America. (JGK)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 BRIEFING ORDER re: #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Return of Property. On or before October 6, 2022, Defendants shall file a memorandum in response to Plaintiffs motion. On or before October 13, 2022, Plaintiffs may (but are not required to) file a reply memorandum. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. See Order for specifics. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/23/2022.(RMM) Modified text on 9/23/2022 (RMM).
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. (Text-Only) BRIEFING ORDER re: #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Return of Property. On or before October 6, 2022, Defendants shall file a memorandum in response to Plaintiffs motion. On or before October 13, 2022, Plaintiffs may (but are not required to) file a reply memorandum. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. See Order for specifics. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/23/2022.(RMM) Modified text on 9/23/2022 (CLK).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc. re #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property , #12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan Dershowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9775981, 3 Notice of Initial Case Assignment, #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt Olsen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9773375, 5 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney,,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #11 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Order of Recusal, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc. re #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property , #12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan Dershowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9775981, 3 Notice of Initial Case Assignment, #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt Olsen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9773375, 5 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney,,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #11 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Order of Recusal, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc. re #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property , #12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan Dershowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9775981, 3 Notice of Initial Case Assignment, #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt Olsen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9773375, 5 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney,,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #11 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Order of Recusal, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. Christopher Wray served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. Merrick Garland served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. United States of America served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property : Date and time to be determined. (Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan Dershowitz for Michael J. Lindell. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/22/2022. (KMO)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion #9 is DENIED to the extent it seeks an ex parte temporary restraining order directing Defendants to refrain from accessing or taking any action with respect to the seized cellphone until a hearing on that aspect of their Motion seeking a preliminary injunction. See Order for additional details and procedures. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/22/2022.(RMM)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc..(Parker, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan Dershowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9775981 filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Parker, Andrew)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc..(Parker, Andrew)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Return of Property filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, EXHIBITS ALL FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - #2 Exhibit(s) Index, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4)(Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 9/22/2022 (MMP). Modified text on 9/22/2022 (MMP). Modified text on 9/30/2022 (kt).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Return of Property filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR: MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt Olsen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9773375 filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 11/16/2022 (KMO).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-2290 (ECT/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/21/2022.(MKB)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PERMANENTLY SEALED PER ECT CHAMBERS - EXHIBIT A re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael J. Lindell, MyPillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 9/22/2022 (MMP). Modified text on 9/30/2022 (kt).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kurt Olsen, Patrick M. McSweeney, Alan Dershowitz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the, United States of America, Christopher Wray. (MKB) Modified date on 9/21/2022 (MKB).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2290 (ECT/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for My Pillow, Inc.. (Parker, Andrew)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9771723) filed by Michael J Lindell, My Pillow, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (Parker, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindell et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Lindell
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Pillow, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Lindell
Represented By: Alan Dershowitz
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Patrick M McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MyPillow, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron Teitelbaum
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Represented By: Frank Lin
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Frank Lin
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Jacobson
Represented By: Aaron Teitelbaum
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Aaron Teitelbaum
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Frank Lin
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the District of Minnesota, the
Represented By: Aaron Teitelbaum
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Represented By: Frank Lin
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?