Anderson v. Jetoh
Plaintiff: Antaeus Anderson
Defendant: Sherice Jetoh
Case Number: 0:2022cv02468
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(ABR)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The application to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiff Antaeus Anderson #2 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/18/2022.(RMM)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Antaeus Anderson. (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/28/2022 (JME).
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherice Jetoh filed by Antaeus Anderson. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights Housing/Accomodations ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (MMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Jetoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antaeus Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherice Jetoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?