Chamberlin et al v. Home Partners of America et al
Plaintiff: Christopher William Chamberlin, Selene Eluna-Rey Draculea and Family
Defendant: Home Partners of America, William Young, Joe Florczak and Pathlight Property Management
Case Number: 0:2022cv02523
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 CORRECTED LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (KAT)
November 17, 2022 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (KAT) Modified text on 11/18/2022 (kt).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. The Court gives Plaintiffs 60 days to file an amended complaint, failing which the Court will review the case on the basis of the Complaint itself. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/17/2022. (KAT)
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher William Chamberlin, Selene Eluna-Rey Draculea. (JGK)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Florczak, Home Partners of America, Pathlight Property Management, William Young filed by Christopher William Chamberlin, Family, Selene Eluna-Rey Draculea. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Kate M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlin et al v. Home Partners of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher William Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selene Eluna-Rey Draculea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Partners of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Florczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathlight Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?