Remme v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Richard Remme
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2022cv02586
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 (Text-Only) Notice to Attorney - Local Rule Change re Social Security Actions:The Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) establish new briefing deadlines for all Social Security actions filed on or after December 1, 2022. For Social Security Actions filed before December 1, 2022, the deadlines previously established by local rule continue to apply: Unless granted an extension, the plaintiff must file his or her opening brief within 60 days of the filing of the answer and administrative record; the Commissioner must file a responsive brief within 45 days of the filing of plaintiffs opening brief; and the plaintiff may file a reply brief within 14 days of the Commissioners filing of the responsive brief. (JML)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bryan Konoski for Richard Remme. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/22/2022. (KMO)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney BRYAN KONOSKI. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9907690 filed by Richard Remme. (Konoski, Bryan)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Richard Remme. Kilolo Kijakazi served 10/25/22. Answer due 12/27/2022. (Greeman, James) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (CLK).
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (ABR)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (ABR)
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Ony) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Social Security List. Please use case number 22-cv-2586 (LIB). (ABR)
October 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9832115) filed by Richard Remme. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greeman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Remme v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Remme
Represented By: James H Greeman
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: James D. Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?