Meagher v. Paynesville Area Schools, Independent School District No. 741
Plaintiff: Tammy L Meagher and Tammy L. Meagher
Defendant: Paynesville Area Schools, Independent School District No. 741 and Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741
Case Number: 0:2022cv02651
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2023. Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 11/30/2023. Motions (disp) due by 12/31/2023. Ready for trial due by 4/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/2/2022.(JLB)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Tammy L. Meagher. (Cote, Brian)
November 29, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Tammy L. Meagher. Jointly Signed by Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741.(Cote, Brian)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741. (Ervin, Michael)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 6th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2651 (MJD/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741 re #3 Answer to Complaint of Tammy L. Meagher (Ervin, Michael)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District No. 741 ANSWER to Complaint of Tammy L. Meagher filed by Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741. (Ervin, Michael)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741 filed by Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741. (Ervin, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Stearns County Minnesota District Court, case number 73-CV-22-8675 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9843030) filed by Paynesville Area Schools, Independent School District No. 741. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ervin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meagher v. Paynesville Area Schools, Independent School District No. 741
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L. Meagher
Represented By: Brian E Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paynesville Area Schools, Independent School District No. 741
Represented By: Michael J. Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paynesville Area Schools Independent School District #741
Represented By: Michael J. Ervin
Represented By: Michael J Waldspurger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?