Dooley v. Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Dooley
Defendant: Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv02823
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/29/2022.(LNP)
December 27, 2022 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Michael Dooley.(Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Kaarin Nelson Schaffer in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Michael Dooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 15)(Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Michael Dooley. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
December 21, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dooley. Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc. served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Derek Guilbault)(Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
December 8, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (ACH)
December 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin D Kappenman on behalf of Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (Kappenman, Martin)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Joint Motion for Extension of Memorandum Deadlines Related to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #11 is GRANTED. Response due by 12/27/2022. Reply due by 1/10/2023. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/29/2022. (RMM)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process Joint Motion filed by Michael Dooley.(Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process Joint Motion filed by Michael Dooley. (Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. filed by Michael Dooley. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Derek Guilbault, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons) (Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin) Modified text on 11/21/2022 (KNK). Modified text on 12/8/2022 (ACH).
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc..(Peters, Gregory)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 Declaration of Gregory L. Peters in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Peters, Gregory)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Peters, Gregory)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process : Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Peters, Gregory)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Insufficiency of Process filed by Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (Peters, Gregory)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (Peters, Gregory)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 22-cv-2823 ECT/DJF.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. (Peters, Gregory)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for Hennepin County, Minnesota, case number 27-CV-22-14169 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9871775) filed by Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service of Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Judicial Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - State Ct Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Plf Letter to Court Admin, #8 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Affidavit of Service) (Peters, Gregory) Modified text on 11/4/2022 (CLK). Modified text on 11/4/2022 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley v. Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dooley
Represented By: Kaarin Nelson Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyer Ford Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L Peters
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?