Johnson v. Channel One, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson
Defendant: Channel One, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv02836
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2023 at 10:30 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
December 23, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint filed by Channel One, Inc.. (Van Rybroek, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Channel One's motion to dismiss #7 is DENIED AS MOOT. The hearing on the motion #8 is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/20/2022. (RMM)
December 18, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Channel One, Inc.. filed by Jeffrey Johnson. No summons requested. (Frank, Matthew)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/28/2022. (HAM)
November 28, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Channel One, Inc..(Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Channel One, Inc..(Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Channel One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Channel One, Inc.. (Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Channel One, Inc.. (Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Van Rybroek on behalf of Channel One, Inc.. (Van Rybroek, Christopher)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Channel One, Inc. (ABR)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2836 (ECT/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint filed by Channel One, Inc. filed by Jeffrey Johnson. (Frank, Matthew)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9874746) filed by Jeffrey Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. (Frank, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Channel One, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson
Represented By: Matthew A Frank
Represented By: Stephen M Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channel One, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Van Rybroek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?