Monette et al v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: John J. Monette and Annie Monette
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv02842
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2023. Fact Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 10/1/2023. Motions (disp) due by 9/1/2023. Ready for trial due by 1/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/30/2022.(JLB)
December 22, 2022 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF CASE as to John J. Monette, Annie Monette. (Docherty, Michael)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Menard, Inc.. (Tomsche, Steven)
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Menard, Inc.. Jointly Signed by John Monette and Annie Monette.(Tomsche, Steven)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance for Alan S Milavetz by Michael R Docherty on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Docherty, Michael) Modified text on 11/21/2022 (MTB).
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Docherty on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Docherty, Michael)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel V Wolski on behalf of Menard, Inc.. (Wolski, Gabriel)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Menard, Inc.. (Tomsche, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2842 WMW/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Tomsche on behalf of Menard, Inc.. (Tomsche, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Menard, Inc.. (Tomsche, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-22-5903 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9875931) filed by Menard, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Tomsche, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monette et al v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Monette
Represented By: Alan S Milavetz
Represented By: Michael R Docherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Monette
Represented By: Michael R Docherty
Represented By: Alan S Milavetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E Tomsche
Represented By: Gabriel V Wolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?