Benedict v. Smith
Plaintiff: Melissa J. Benedict
Defendant: Robert Earl Bud Smith
Case Number: 0:2022cv02859
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2023. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 1/31/2024. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2024. Ready for trial due by 5/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/6/2023.(JLB)
December 22, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Melissa J. Benedict. (Raboin, John)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John S Raboin on behalf of Melissa J. Benedict. (Raboin, John)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Robert Earl Bud Smith. (Wood, Brian)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Robert Earl Bud Smith. Jointly Signed by Melissa Benedict.(Wood, Brian)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Meshbesher on behalf of Robert Earl Bud Smith. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2859 KMM/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Robert Earl Bud Smith. (Wood, Brian)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Earl Bud Smith. (Wood, Brian)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9878987) filed by Robert Earl Bud Smith. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedict v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa J. Benedict
Represented By: John S Raboin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Earl Bud Smith
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Brandon Meshbesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?