Kraft Heinz Foods Company v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Cargill Protein, National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv02904
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 - APPOINTMENT OF LIAISON COUNSEL AND MASTER COMPLAINT.MDL PRETRIAL ORDER Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 12/1/2022.Associated Cases: 0:22-md-03031-JRT-JFD et al.(KKM)
November 15, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION filed in 20-md-3031 JRT/JFD, all papers shall be filed in Case No. 22-md-3031 JRT/JFD and no further papers shall be filed in this individual case docket. (CLK)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2022.(CLK)
November 15, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-05863. Original file certified copy of CTO-7 and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty.
November 15, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-7), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Minnesota for the reasons stated in the order of June 3, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. (TL) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 12 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-7), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Minnesota for the reasons stated in the order of June 3, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (TL) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Case transferred to District of Minnesota. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (TL) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the time to answer or otherwise move is extended to 11/4/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/2/2022. (GS) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. National Beef Packing Company served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. Cargill, Inc. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 1/24/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 1/10/2023. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/7/2022. (JR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation (a/k/a Cargill Protein), Cargill, Inc., National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15994357 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES; filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rider to Summons) (Iovieno, Philip) Modified. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/15/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft Heinz Foods Company v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Protein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?