Hathaway v. Neighborhood House et al
Plaintiff: Sara A. Hathaway
Defendant: Literacy Minnesota, Neighborhood House and Minnesota Literacy Council, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv03040
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2023 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice filed by Literacy Minnesota, #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Neighborhood House. Matter submitted. Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (las)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Literacy Minnesota.(Edgerton Hall, Erin)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice filed by Literacy Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edgerton Hall, Erin)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Reply to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Neighborhood House. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Louwagie, Samuel)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice, #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Sara A. Hathaway. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leland, Daniel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Neighborhood House.(Louwagie, Samuel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Neighborhood House. (Louwagie, Samuel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Neighborhood House.(Louwagie, Samuel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Neighborhood House. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Louwagie, Samuel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Louwagie, Samuel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Neighborhood House. (Louwagie, Samuel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice filed by Literacy Minnesota.(Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice : Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Literacy Minnesota.(Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice filed by Literacy Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General With Prejudice filed by Literacy Minnesota. (Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-3040 (DWF/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Literacy Minnesota re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement upon Plaintiff Sara A. Hathaway (Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Literacy Minnesota. (Edgerton Hall, Erin)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-22-6420 (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-9938901) filed by Literacy Minnesota, Neighborhood House. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Record, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Edgerton Hall, Erin) Modified text on 12/8/2022 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hathaway v. Neighborhood House et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Literacy Minnesota
Represented By: Bryan J. Morben
Represented By: Erin M Edgerton Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighborhood House
Represented By: R Ann Huntrods
Represented By: Samuel N. Louwagie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Literacy Council, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Morben
Represented By: Erin M Edgerton Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara A. Hathaway
Represented By: Daniel Gray Leland
Represented By: Ryan T Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?