Federal National Mortgage Association v. Mashak et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Donald Mashak, Provident Bank, The, John Doe and Mary Roe
Case Number: 0:2022cv03117
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #37 MOTION for Sanctions , #40 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #41 Declaration in Support, #38 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #39 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #43 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #42 Meet and Confer Statement (Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Sanctions #37 Motion for Sanctions. (Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #37 Motion for Sanctions filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Second Declaration of Kevin T. Dobie in Support of #37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #39 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #37 MOTION for Sanctions : Date and time to be determined. (Dobie, Kevin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Dobie, Kevin)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER from Wright County District Court acknowledging receipt of #33 Order of Remand. (ACH)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Wright County District Court enclosing #33 Order of Remand. c/c: Wright County District Court. (MTB)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MTB)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court and remanding action to state court; denying #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response & to Strike Pleading; and denying #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/8/2023. (BJP)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Mashak re #29 Declaration in Support, #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #31 Exhibit, #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #30 Declaration in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/17/2023 (ABR).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Index of Exhibits re #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Donald Mashak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/17/2023 (ABR).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Don Mashak in Opposition to #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/17/2023 (ABR).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Declaration of Don Mashak in Support of #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/17/2023 (ABR).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/17/2023 (ABR).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak. (ACH) Document QC'd on 2/17/2023 (ABR).
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text-Only) ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Remand (ECF No. #8 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 1/31/2023.(LNP)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Mashak re #23 Declaration in Opposition, #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #24 Exhibit (ACH) Document QC'd on 2/7/2023 (ABR).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXHIBIT Index re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Donald Mashak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(ACH) Modified text on 1/31/2023 (ACH). Document QC'd on 2/7/2023 (ABR).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Don Mashak in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/7/2023 (ABR).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/7/2023 (ABR).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text-Only) ORDER granting in part #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying #17 Motion to Strike Pleading.On January 11, 2023, the Defendant filed a Motion to Strike and a Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 17.) That dual motion is denied in part and granted in part. The Motion to Strike is denied. The Motion for additional time to respond to the pending Motion for Remand is granted in part. The Defendant may have until January 30, 2023, to submit a response. No further briefing will be allowed and the matter will be decided on the papers following the receipt of the Defendant's response. Ordered by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/12/2023. (KAT)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Mashak re #19 Exhibit, #18 Declaration in Support, #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/31/2023 (MTB).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 EXHIBIT 1-7 re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Modified date filed and Document QC'd on 1/31/2023 (MTB).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Declaration of Don Mashak in Support of #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak.(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/31/2023 (MTB).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing,, MOTION to Strike Pleading #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Mashak. (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/31/2023 (MTB).
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PARTIAL REBUTTAL AND COMMENT by Donald Mashak re #6 Letter to Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(ACH) Document QCd on 2/7/2023 (MMG).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Motion for Remand filed in this matter. The defendants may have until January 16, 2023, to submit any written response. At that time, the Court will take the matter under advisement and no further briefing is needed. The hearing scheduled for February 27, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. is hereby cancelled, and this matter will be resolved on the papers. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/6/2023. (KAT)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #11 Declaration in Support, #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #12 Meet and Confer Statement (Dobie, Kevin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Dobie, Kevin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Dobie, Kevin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of Kevin T. Dobie in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Dobie, Kevin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dobie, Kevin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Dobie, Kevin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Dobie, Kevin)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald Mashak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/20/2023 (MTB).
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Federal National Mortgage Association . (Dobie, Kevin)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Donald Mashak. (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/28/2022 (JGK).
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION in Support re #1 Notice of Removal, by Donald Mashak. (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/28/2022 (JGK).
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wright County, case number 86-CV-15-1271 filed by Donald Mashak. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Kate M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #2 Notice to State of Removal, #3 Enjoined Indespensible Party of Federal Reserve System Board of Governors Removal, #4 Notice of Succinct Party Contact Information, #5 State Court Complaint and Exhibits, #6 Certificate of Related Parties, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Modified text on 12/20/2022 (JGK). Document QC'd on 12/28/2022 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Mashak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: John P Dockry
Represented By: Kalli L Ostlie
Represented By: Kevin T Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Mashak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Bank, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?